NE LR178 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-08-17 - Notice of hearing for October 07, 2021 (cancel)
Pending: Legislature Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Interim study to solicit input from Nebraskans regarding funds from the federal American Rescue Plan Act of 2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interim study to solicit input from Nebraskans regarding funds from the federal American Rescue Plan Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-17LegislatureNotice of hearing for October 07, 2021 (cancel)
2021-08-17LegislatureNotice of hearing for October 05, 2021
2021-07-29LegislatureNotice of hearing for October 07, 2021
2021-05-20LegislatureReferred to Appropriations Committee
2021-05-18LegislatureReferred to Executive Board
2021-05-18LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback