NE LR138 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-08 - Notice of hearing for December 06, 2019
Pending: Legislature Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-08 - Notice of hearing for December 06, 2019
Pending: Legislature Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to identify for adoption by the Legislature three to five infrastructure project opportunities in eastern Nebraska to provide flood control, a reliable drinking water supply, power generation, climate change mitigation, and recreation
Title
Interim study to identify for adoption by the Legislature three to five infrastructure project opportunities in eastern Nebraska to provide flood control, a reliable drinking water supply, power generation, climate change mitigation, and recreation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for December 06, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=39950 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LR138.pdf |