NE LB994A | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Approved by Governor on April 15, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Approved by Governor on April 15, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriation Bill
Title
Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 15, 2014 |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 09, 2014 |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 44-0-5 |
2014-04-07 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER229 adopted |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER229 filed |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER229 |
2014-03-25 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2014-03-25 | Legislature | Mello AM2587 adopted |
2014-03-25 | Legislature | Mello AM2587 filed |
2014-03-19 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2014-03-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |