NE LB994 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Approved by Governor on April 15, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Approved by Governor on April 15, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change fees as prescribed for vital statistics
Title
Change fees as prescribed for vital statistics
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 15, 2014 |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 09, 2014 |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-1-2 |
2014-04-07 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2014-03-25 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2014-02-26 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2014-02-21 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2014-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2014 |
2014-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2014-01-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |