NE LB98 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB98 amended into LB411 by AM1379
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB98 amended into LB411 by AM1379
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change signature requirements for nomination of partisan candidates by petition
Title
Change signature requirements for nomination of partisan candidates by petition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB98 amended into LB411 by AM1379 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed |
2019-04-03 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM1189 filed |
2019-04-03 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1189 |
2019-03-13 | Legislature | Wayne AM712 filed |
2019-03-04 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 13, 2019 |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=36899 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB98.pdf |