NE LB974 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit consideration of political affiliation, demographic information, and previous election results in drawing legislative districts
Title
Prohibit consideration of political affiliation, demographic information, and previous election results in drawing legislative districts
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Vargas [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-02-07 | Legislature | McCollister name added |
2018-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2018 |
2018-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2018-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34348 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB974.pdf |