NE LB971 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change the name of the Brain Injury Trust Fund Act to the Brain Injury Assistance Act and change certain provisions in the act
Title
Change the name of the Brain Injury Trust Fund Act to the Brain Injury Assistance Act and change certain provisions in the act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 12, 2022 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 |
2022-04-05 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2022-03-31 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2022-03-31 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. FA91 withdrawn |
2022-03-31 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER113 adopted |
2022-03-10 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. FA91 filed |
2022-03-09 | Legislature | Wayne name added |
2022-03-02 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER113 filed |
2022-03-02 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER113 |
2022-02-28 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2022-02-10 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2022-01-21 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 28, 2022 |
2022-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |