NE LB957 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB957 amended into LB863 by AM1913
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB957 amended into LB863 by AM1913
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of the Insurers Investment Act
Title
Change provisions of the Insurers Investment Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Flood [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB957 amended into LB863 by AM1913 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2022 |
2022-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2022-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |