NE LB938 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Approved by Governor on March 18, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Approved by Governor on March 18, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of the County Purchasing Act
Title
Change provisions of the County Purchasing Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brandt [N] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-15 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2214 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2214 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 18, 2024 |
2024-03-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 15, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2024-03-15 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 |
2024-03-15 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2024-03-15 | Legislature | Wayne FA293 not considered |
2024-03-15 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File withdrawn |
2024-03-15 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File pending |
2024-03-15 | Legislature | Wayne FA293 filed |
2024-03-12 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2024-03-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2024-02-21 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2024-02-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2024-02-08 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2214 adopted |
2024-02-02 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2214 filed |
2024-02-02 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2214 |
2024-01-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2024 |
2024-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2024-01-04 | Legislature | Date of introduction |