NE LB938 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the 911 Service System Act, change a reporting requirement as prescribed, and transfer funds from the Enhanced Wireless 911 Fund to the 911 Service System Fund
Title
Adopt the 911 Service System Act, change a reporting requirement as prescribed, and transfer funds from the Enhanced Wireless 911 Fund to the 911 Service System Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Smith [N] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-12 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 18, 2016 |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 12, 2016 |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate withdrawn |
2016-04-07 | Legislature | Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate filed |
2016-04-04 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST82 |
2016-04-01 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2016-04-01 | Legislature | Smith AM2769 adopted |
2016-04-01 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER225 adopted |
2016-03-29 | Legislature | Smith AM2769 filed |
2016-03-24 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER225 filed |
2016-03-24 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER225 |
2016-03-22 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2016-03-22 | Legislature | Smith AM2301 withdrawn |
2016-03-22 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM2356 adopted |
2016-03-03 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM2356 filed |
2016-03-03 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2356 |
2016-02-25 | Legislature | Smith AM2301 filed |
2016-02-22 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 29, 2016 (rehearing) |
2016-02-19 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications priority bill |
2016-01-22 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2016 |
2016-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2016-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |