NE LB932 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide voting rights for residents of sanitary and improvement districts
Title
Provide voting rights for residents of sanitary and improvement districts
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Krist [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-01-17 | Notice of hearing for January 24, 2012 | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee | |
2012-01-10 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=15553 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB932.pdf |