NE LB927 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1250 amended into LB927 by AM2505
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1250 amended into LB927 by AM2505
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the Civic and Community Center Financing Act, the Convention Center Facility Financing Assistance Act, the Property Tax Request Act, and the Sports Arena Facility Financing Assistance Act
Title
Change provisions relating to the Civic and Community Center Financing Act, the Convention Center Facility Financing Assistance Act, the Property Tax Request Act, and the Sports Arena Facility Financing Assistance Act
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Pahls [N] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 38-2-9 (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Legislature - Linehan AM2778 adopted (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Legislature - Revenue AM2023 adopted (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Legislature - Hansen, B. AM2505 adopted (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Legislature - McKinney AM2632 adopted (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Legislature - Linehan AM2778 adopted (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Legislature - Revenue AM2023 adopted (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Legislature - Hansen, B. AM2505 adopted (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Legislature - McKinney AM2632 adopted (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1250 amended into LB927 by AM2505 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB818 amended into LB927 by AM2023 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 19, 2022 |
2022-04-13 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 13, 2022 |
2022-04-13 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2022-04-13 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 38-2-9 |
2022-04-13 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2022-04-13 | Legislature | Hansen, M. FA174 withdrawn |
2022-04-11 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST74 |
2022-04-11 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2022-04-11 | Legislature | Linehan AM2778 adopted |
2022-04-11 | Legislature | Hansen, M. FA173 withdrawn |
2022-04-11 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER166 adopted |
2022-04-08 | Legislature | Linehan AM2778 filed |
2022-04-05 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER166 filed |
2022-04-05 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER166 |
2022-03-31 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2022-03-31 | Legislature | Revenue AM2023 adopted |
2022-03-31 | Legislature | Flood AM2677 withdrawn |
2022-03-31 | Legislature | Hansen, M. FA172 withdrawn |
2022-03-31 | Legislature | Hansen, B. AM2505 adopted |
2022-03-31 | Legislature | McKinney AM2632 adopted |
2022-03-31 | Legislature | McKinney AM2242 withdrawn |
2022-03-30 | Legislature | Flood AM2677 filed |
2022-03-29 | Legislature | McKinney AM2632 filed |
2022-03-25 | Legislature | Hansen, M. FA174 filed |
2022-03-25 | Legislature | Hansen, M. FA173 filed |
2022-03-25 | Legislature | Hansen, M. FA172 filed |
2022-03-23 | Legislature | Hansen, B. AM2505 filed |
2022-03-11 | Legislature | McKinney AM2242 pending |
2022-03-11 | Legislature | Revenue AM2023 pending |
2022-03-11 | Legislature | McKinney AM2242 filed |
2022-02-24 | Legislature | Revenue AM2023 filed |
2022-02-24 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2023 |
2022-02-22 | Legislature | Flood priority bill |
2022-02-03 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 10, 2022 |
2022-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |