NE LB916 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Controlled Substance Offenses Forfeiture Act and change provisions relating to forfeiture
Title
Adopt the Controlled Substance Offenses Forfeiture Act and change provisions relating to forfeiture
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-02-14 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 21, 2024 |
2024-01-31 | Legislature | Conrad name added |
2024-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-04 | Legislature | Date of introduction |