NE LB894 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB894 amended into LB707 by AM1859
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB894 amended into LB707 by AM1859
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to accounting firm ownership
Title
Change provisions relating to accounting firm ownership
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB894 amended into LB707 by AM1859 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-12 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2022 |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2022-01-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |