NE LB831 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide annual salary limitations for elected officials of political subdivisions
Title
Provide annual salary limitations for elected officials of political subdivisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-18 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2018-01-04 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34279 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB831.pdf |