NE LB83 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Approved by Governor on April 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Approved by Governor on April 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change public meeting provisions and provide for virtual conferencing under the Open Meetings Act
Title
Change public meeting provisions and provide for virtual conferencing under the Open Meetings Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Flood [N] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 43-0-6 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Legislature - Flood AM750 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM127 adopted (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Legislature - Flood AM750 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM127 adopted (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Day explanation of vote |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Blood explanation of vote |
2021-04-15 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-04-15 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 43-0-6 |
2021-04-15 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2021-04-09 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST7 |
2021-04-06 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-04-06 | Legislature | Flood AM750 adopted |
2021-04-06 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER23 adopted |
2021-03-23 | Legislature | Flood AM750 filed |
2021-03-17 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER23 filed |
2021-03-17 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER23 |
2021-03-15 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-03-15 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM127 adopted |
2021-03-10 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs priority bill |
2021-02-16 | Legislature | Hansen, M. name added |
2021-02-16 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM127 filed |
2021-02-16 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM127 |
2021-02-01 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. name added |
2021-01-19 | Legislature | Brandt name added |
2021-01-19 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 27, 2021 |
2021-01-15 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2021-01-15 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2021-01-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |