NE LB817 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-30 - Approved by Governor on March 30, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-30 - Approved by Governor on March 30, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Direct Primary Care Agreement Act
Title
Adopt the Direct Primary Care Agreement Act
Sponsors
Sen. Merv Riepe [N] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 30, 2016 |
2016-03-24 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 24, 2016 |
2016-03-24 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2016-03-24 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 |
2016-03-21 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2016-03-17 | Legislature | Kintner name added |
2016-03-17 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2016-03-15 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2016-03-08 | Legislature | Groene name added |
2016-03-08 | Legislature | Davis name added |
2016-03-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2016-02-23 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2016-02-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 09, 2016 |
2016-02-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 02, 2016 (cancel) |
2016-02-01 | Legislature | Hadley motion to suspend rules to permit cancellation of hearing prevailed |
2016-01-22 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 02, 2016 |
2016-01-12 | Legislature | Schnoor name added |
2016-01-12 | Legislature | Riepe priority bill |
2016-01-12 | Legislature | Coash name added |
2016-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2016-01-08 | Legislature | Fox name added |
2016-01-08 | Legislature | Brasch name added |
2016-01-08 | Legislature | Baker name added |
2016-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |