NE LB81 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB81 amended into LB799 by AM1255
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB81 amended into LB799 by AM1255
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change number of county judges in Buffalo and Hall counties
Title
Change number of county judges in Buffalo and Hall counties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB81 amended into LB799 by AM1255 |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Indefinitely Postponed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO270 Bracket until June 2, 2023 filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO267 Bracket until June 1, 2023 filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO271 Recommit to Judiciary Committee filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO269 Recommit to Judiciary Committee filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO266 Recommit to Judiciary Committee filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO268 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO265 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6 Section 3(f) filed |
2023-03-14 | Legislature | Aguilar priority bill |
2023-02-23 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. AM534 filed |
2023-02-13 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2023-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 03, 2023 |
2023-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |