NE LB778 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require voter approval for school district building fund levies
Title
Require voter approval for school district building fund levies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-03-22 | Legislature | Groene MO288 failed |
2018-03-22 | Legislature | Groene MO288 Invoke cloture filed |
2018-03-22 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks AM2562 pending |
2018-03-22 | Legislature | Baker MO287 failed |
2018-03-22 | Legislature | Baker MO287 Bracket until April 18, 2018 filed |
2018-03-22 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks AM2562 pending |
2018-03-22 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks AM2562 filed |
2018-03-22 | Legislature | Education AM2098 pending |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Education AM2098 filed |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2098 |
2018-02-20 | Legislature | Education priority bill |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 16, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2018-01-05 | Legislature | Brewer name added |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=33995 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB778.pdf |