NE LB777 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Approved by Governor on April 10, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Approved by Governor on April 10, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change license renewal and issuance provisions under the Motor Vehicle Operator's License Act
Title
Change license renewal and issuance provisions under the Motor Vehicle Operator's License Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 10, 2014 |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 10, 2014 |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2014-03-25 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM1645 adopted |
2014-01-29 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM1645 filed |
2014-01-29 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1645 |
2014-01-14 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 21, 2014 |
2014-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2014-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |