NE LB769 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely postponed
Status: Introduced on January 7 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely postponed
Summary
Provide for immunity from liability for county clerks regarding incorrect or false marriage license application information
Title
Provide for immunity from liability for county clerks regarding incorrect or false marriage license application information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2010-01-14 | Notice of hearing for January 22, 2010 | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-01-07 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9894 |