NE LB736 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide restrictions on occupation taxes, license fees, and regulation by counties and municipalities
Title
Provide restrictions on occupation taxes, license fees, and regulation by counties and municipalities
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Murman [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-02-19 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 28, 2019 |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37720 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB736.pdf |