NE LB736 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Approved by Governor on April 10, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Approved by Governor on April 10, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change the service of notice provision in the One-Call Notification System Act
Title
Change the service of notice provision in the One-Call Notification System Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 10, 2014 |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 09, 2014 |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER201 adopted |
2014-03-26 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER201 filed |
2014-03-26 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER201 |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM1811 adopted |
2014-02-06 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM1811 filed |
2014-02-06 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1811 |
2014-01-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 27, 2014 |
2014-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2014-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |