NE LB722 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Stroke System of Care Act
Title
Adopt the Stroke System of Care Act
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Baker [N] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-12 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-2-2 (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 18, 2016 |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 12, 2016 |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 45-2-2 |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate withdrawn |
2016-04-07 | Legislature | Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate filed |
2016-03-15 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2016-03-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2016-03-10 | Legislature | Baker AM2435 adopted |
2016-03-07 | Legislature | Baker AM2435 filed |
2016-03-07 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2016-03-02 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2016-03-02 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM2126 adopted |
2016-02-22 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM2126 filed |
2016-02-22 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2126 |
2016-02-19 | Legislature | Baker priority bill |
2016-01-14 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 22, 2016 |
2016-01-07 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Date of introduction |