NE LB70A | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-29 - Communication
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-29 - Communication
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriation Bill
Title
Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 34-11-4 (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Communication |
2015-05-28 | Legislature | Returned by Governor without approval on May 27, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 21, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 34-11-4 |
2015-04-08 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2015-04-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2015-03-30 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2015-03-26 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2015-03-24 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2015-03-24 | Legislature | Date of introduction |