NE LB701 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Approved by Governor on April 10, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Approved by Governor on April 10, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to salvage titles and acquisition of salvage titles by insurance companies
Title
Change provisions relating to salvage titles and acquisition of salvage titles by insurance companies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 10, 2014 |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 09, 2014 |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2014-03-26 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Dubas AM2322 adopted |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM1905 lost |
2014-03-21 | Legislature | Dubas AM2322 filed |
2014-02-20 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM1905 filed |
2014-02-20 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1905 |
2014-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 04, 2014 |
2014-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2014-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |