NE LB656 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize municipalities to provide broadband and Internet services
Title
Authorize municipalities to provide broadband and Internet services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2021-02-02 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 09, 2021 |
2021-02-01 | Legislature | Wayne MO5 withdrawn |
2021-01-28 | Legislature | Wayne MO5 Rerefer LB656 to the Urban Affairs Committee |
2021-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2021-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |