NE LB653 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempt certain purchases of energy star qualified products from sales and use taxes
Title
Exempt certain purchases of energy star qualified products from sales and use taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2015-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 06, 2015 |
2015-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2015-01-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |