NE LB611 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require train crews of at least two individuals
Title
Require train crews of at least two individuals
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brandt [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-04-05 | Legislature | Wishart name added |
2019-02-27 | Legislature | Wayne name added |
2019-02-26 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2019-02-19 | Legislature | Lathrop name added |
2019-02-19 | Legislature | Howard name added |
2019-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 05, 2019 |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2019-01-24 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37858 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB611.pdf |