NE LB6 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB6 amended into LB207 by AM507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB6 amended into LB207 by AM507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for release of a summarized report by the office of Inspector General of Nebraska Child Welfare
Title
Provide for release of a summarized report by the office of Inspector General of Nebraska Child Welfare
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Krist [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB6 amended into LB207 by AM507 |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed |
2017-01-27 | Legislature | Executive Board AM38 filed |
2017-01-27 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM38 |
2017-01-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 20, 2017 |
2017-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2017-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31407 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB6.pdf |