NE LB590 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 17, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Require use of Nebraska Early Childhood Professional Record System for documentation and verification of staff training

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require use of Nebraska Early Childhood Professional Record System for documentation and verification of staff training

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Legislature - Briese MO54 prevailed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Legislature - Chambers MO55 failed (Y: 1 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - Legislature - Chambers MO53 failed (Y: 0 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - Legislature - Chambers MO52 failed (Y: 1 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - Legislature - Chambers MO51 failed (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - Legislature - Chambers MO50 failed (Y: 1 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - Legislature - Motion to overrule Chair failed (Y: 1 N: 40 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-03-13 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM330 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 17, 2019
2019-04-11LegislaturePresented to Governor on April 11, 2019
2019-04-11LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2019-04-11LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 48-0-1
2019-04-04LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2019-04-03LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2019-04-03LegislatureBriese MO54 prevailed
2019-04-03LegislatureBriese MO54 Invoke cloture filed
2019-04-03LegislatureChambers MO55 failed
2019-04-03LegislatureChambers MO55 Reconsider the vote to bracket filed
2019-04-03LegislatureChambers MO53 failed
2019-04-03LegislatureChambers MO53 Bracket until April 15, 2019 filed
2019-04-03LegislatureChambers MO52 failed
2019-04-03LegislatureChambers MO52 Reconsider the vote to indefinitely postpone filed
2019-04-03LegislatureChambers MO51 failed
2019-04-03LegislatureChambers MO51 pending
2019-04-03LegislatureChambers MO51 Indefinitely postpone filed
2019-04-03LegislatureChambers MO50 failed
2019-04-03LegislatureChambers MO50 Recommit to the Health and Human Services Committee filed
2019-04-03LegislatureMotion to overrule Chair failed
2019-04-03LegislatureChair ruled AM1146 is not germane
2019-04-03LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER48 adopted
2019-04-02LegislatureChambers AM1146 filed
2019-03-14LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER48 filed
2019-03-14LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER48
2019-03-13LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2019-03-13LegislatureHealth and Human Services AM330 adopted
2019-02-21LegislatureHealth and Human Services AM330 filed
2019-02-21LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM330
2019-01-29LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 08, 2019
2019-01-25LegislatureReferred to Health and Human Services Committee
2019-01-23LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37680
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB590.pdf
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Final/LB590.pdf
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Slip/LB590.pdf
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4164
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4165
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4314
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4317
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4321
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4324
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4327
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4331
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4330
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4332
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4448

Bill Comments

feedback