NE LB575 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Provisions/portions of LB578 amended into LB575 by AM1276
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Provisions/portions of LB578 amended into LB575 by AM1276
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to elections
Title
Change provisions relating to elections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-14 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 43-2-4 (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB578 amended into LB575 by AM1276 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB514 amended into LB575 by AM1276 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB319 amended into LB575 by AM1276 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB311 amended into LB575 by AM1510 |
2015-05-19 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 19, 2015 |
2015-05-14 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 14, 2015 |
2015-05-14 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2015-05-14 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 43-2-4 |
2015-05-14 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2015-05-07 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST35 |
2015-05-05 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2015-05-05 | Legislature | Murante AM1510 adopted |
2015-05-05 | Legislature | Schumacher AM1424 lost |
2015-05-05 | Legislature | Morfeld MO105 withdrawn |
2015-05-05 | Legislature | Morfeld MO105 Bracket until June 05, 2015 filed |
2015-05-05 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER99 adopted |
2015-05-04 | Legislature | Murante AM1510 filed |
2015-05-04 | Legislature | Schumacher AM1424 filed |
2015-04-29 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER99 filed |
2015-04-29 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER99 |
2015-04-23 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2015-04-23 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM1276 adopted |
2015-04-16 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM1276 filed |
2015-04-16 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1276 |
2015-03-12 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs priority bill |
2015-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2015 |
2015-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2015-01-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |