NE LB560 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB560 amended into LB1093 by AM2391
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriate funds to the University of Nebraska and create a fund

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriate funds to the University of Nebraska and create a fund

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-20LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB560 amended into LB1093 by AM2391
2016-04-20LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2016-02-01LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 9, 2016, on AM1897
2016-02-01LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 2, 2016, on AM1897 (cancel)
2016-02-01LegislatureHadley motion to suspend rules to permit cancellation of hearing prevailed
2016-01-25LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 2, 2016, on AM1897
2016-01-25LegislatureMello AM1897 filed
2016-01-06LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2015-02-11LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 03, 2015
2015-01-23LegislatureReferred to Appropriations Committee
2015-01-21LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback