NE LB547 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB547 amended into LB610 by AM1365
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB547 amended into LB610 by AM1365
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create the College Savings Plan Matching Grant Program
Title
Create the College Savings Plan Matching Grant Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB547 amended into LB610 by AM1365 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed |
2019-04-03 | Legislature | Education AM749 filed |
2019-04-03 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM749 |
2019-01-29 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2019 |
2019-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2019-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=36849 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB547.pdf |