NE LB535 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require valid photographic identification and change provisions relating to voting under the Election Act and certain identification documents
Title
Require valid photographic identification and change provisions relating to voting under the Election Act and certain identification documents
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Slama [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB535 amended into LB514 by AM1801 |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Slama AM1833 filed |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Slama AM1802 filed |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Slama AM1806 filed |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Slama AM1817 filed |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Slama AM1818 filed |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Slama AM1819 filed |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Slama AM1820 filed |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Slama AM1821 filed |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Slama AM1822 filed |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Slama AM1823 filed |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Slama AM1824 filed |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Slama AM1825 filed |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Slama AM1826 filed |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Slama AM1827 filed |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Slama AM1816 filed |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Slama AM1815 filed |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Slama AM1814 filed |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Slama AM1813 filed |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Slama AM1812 filed |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Slama AM1811 filed |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Slama AM1810 filed |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Slama AM1809 filed |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Slama AM1807 filed |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Slama AM1808 filed |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM1748 filed |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1748 |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Slama AM1805 filed |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Slama AM1803 filed |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Slama AM1804 filed |
2023-05-17 | Legislature | Slama MO1080 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2023-05-17 | Legislature | Slama MO1079 Bracket until June 10, 2023 filed |
2023-05-17 | Legislature | Slama MO1078 Recommit to the Government, Military, and Veterans Affairs Committee filed |
2023-05-17 | Legislature | Slama MO1077 To suspend Rule 3, Section 14, and withdraw the bill filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Hunt MO632 Bracket until June 2, 2023 filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Hunt MO629 Bracket until June 1, 2023 filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Hunt MO633 Recommit to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Hunt MO631 Recommit to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Hunt MO628 Recommit to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Hunt MO630 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Hunt MO627 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6 Section 3(f) filed |
2023-03-24 | Legislature | Conrad AM934 filed |
2023-03-07 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs priority bill |
2023-02-08 | Legislature | Slama FA20 filed |
2023-01-31 | Legislature | Armendariz name added |
2023-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2023 |
2023-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2023-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |