NE LB524 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the calculation of credits under the Nebraska Property Tax Incentive Act
Title
Change provisions relating to the calculation of credits under the Nebraska Property Tax Incentive Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brandt [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-02-09 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 17, 2021 |
2021-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2021-01-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |