NE LB516 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to child abuse, the Child Protection and Family Safety Act, human trafficking, and child welfare services
Title
Change provisions relating to child abuse, the Child Protection and Family Safety Act, human trafficking, and child welfare services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB516 amended into LB519 by AM1460 |
2019-02-07 | Legislature | Bostelman name added |
2019-02-05 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 22, 2019 |
2019-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37418 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB516.pdf |