NE LB468 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB566 amended into LB468 by AM1855
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB566 amended into LB468 by AM1855
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit inclusion of long-term services and supports under the medicaid managed care program and provide duties for the Department of Health and Human Services and the Department of Insurance
Title
Prohibit inclusion of long-term services and supports under the medicaid managed care program and provide duties for the Department of Health and Human Services and the Department of Insurance
Sponsors
Sen. Lynne Walz [N] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 43-1-5 (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Crawford AM1855 adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Bolz AM1678 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM1166 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Crawford AM1855 adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Bolz AM1678 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM1166 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB566 amended into LB468 by AM1855 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-30 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 43-1-5 |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST29 |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Crawford AM1855 adopted |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Crawford AM1855 filed |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Bolz AM1678 adopted |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER96 adopted |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Bolz AM1678 filed |
2019-04-30 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER96 filed |
2019-04-30 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER96 |
2019-04-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-04-24 | Legislature | Walz AM46 withdrawn |
2019-04-24 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM1166 adopted |
2019-04-05 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM1166 filed |
2019-04-05 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1166 |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Health and Human Services priority bill |
2019-02-07 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 01, 2019 |
2019-02-01 | Legislature | Walz AM46 filed |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |