NE LB457 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change exceptions to school district levy and budget exceptions for voluntary termination agreements
Title
Change exceptions to school district levy and budget exceptions for voluntary termination agreements
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Briese [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB457 amended into LB512 by AM724 |
2017-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 31, 2017 |
2017-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31531 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB457.pdf |