NE LB428 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB428 amended into LB427 by AM739
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Require schools and the State Department of Education to adopt policies relating to pregnant and parenting students

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require schools and the State Department of Education to adopt policies relating to pregnant and parenting students

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB428 amended into LB427 by AM739
2017-03-28LegislatureEducation AM369 filed
2017-03-28LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM369
2017-01-23LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 30, 2017
2017-01-17LegislatureReferred to Education Committee
2017-01-13LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback