NE LB420 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-29 - Provisions/portions of LB420 amended into LB324 by AM662
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-29 - Provisions/portions of LB420 amended into LB324 by AM662
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require acknowledgments from purchasers of real estate in a sanitary and improvement district
Title
Require acknowledgments from purchasers of real estate in a sanitary and improvement district
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB420 amended into LB324 by AM662 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed |
2015-05-28 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed |
2015-02-18 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2015-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 10, 2015 |
2015-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2015-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |