NE LB404 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change State Natural Gas Regulation Act provisions relating to infrastructure system replacement cost recovery charges
Title
Change State Natural Gas Regulation Act provisions relating to infrastructure system replacement cost recovery charges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-03-05 | Legislature | Coash AM2192 filed |
2014-01-16 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM1642 filed |
2014-01-16 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1642 |
2014-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill. |
2013-02-04 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 12, 2013 |
2013-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2013-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=18447 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB404.pdf |