NE LB398 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to broadband speeds and services
Title
Change provisions relating to broadband speeds and services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB398 amended into LB338 by AM845 |
2021-03-24 | Legislature | Clements name added |
2021-03-23 | Legislature | Halloran name added |
2021-03-23 | Legislature | McDonnell name added |
2021-03-23 | Legislature | Kolterman name added |
2021-03-22 | Legislature | Wayne name added |
2021-02-26 | Legislature | Bostelman AM339 filed |
2021-02-02 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 09, 2021 |
2021-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2021-01-14 | Legislature | Date of introduction |