NE LB39 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-11 - Failed to advance to Enrollment and Review Initial
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibit the sale and trade of ivory

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibit the sale and trade of ivory

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-11LegislatureFailed to advance to Enrollment and Review Initial
2018-01-11LegislatureJudiciary AM133 adopted
2018-01-11LegislatureHarr MO167 prevailed
2018-01-11LegislatureHarr MO167 Reconsider the vote on AM133 filed
2018-01-11LegislatureSchumacher FA88 adopted
2018-01-11LegislatureSchumacher FA88 filed
2018-01-11LegislatureJudiciary AM133 lost
2018-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2017-02-14LegislatureJudiciary AM133 filed
2017-02-14LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM133
2017-01-20LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 02, 2017
2017-01-09LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2017-01-05LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback