NE LB388 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-03 - Briese name added
Pending: Legislature Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Nebraska Broadband Bridge Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Nebraska Broadband Bridge Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-03LegislatureBriese name added
2021-01-29LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 08, 2021
2021-01-21LegislatureBrandt name added
2021-01-20LegislatureReferred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
2021-01-15LegislatureBrewer name added
2021-01-15LegislatureSanders name added
2021-01-14LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback