NE LB350 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 26 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Communication
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 26 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Communication
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for setting aside certain misdemeanor and felony convictions
Title
Provide for setting aside certain misdemeanor and felony convictions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 30-11-8 (Y: 30 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Legislature | Communication |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Returned by Governor without approval on March 21, 2018 |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 15, 2018 |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 30-11-8 |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Murante MO230 withdrawn |
2018-02-23 | Legislature | Murante MO230 Recommit to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee filed |
2018-02-23 | Legislature | Murante AM1697 withdrawn |
2018-02-23 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File failed |
2018-02-08 | Legislature | Murante AM1697 filed |
2018-01-30 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2018-01-26 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-01-17 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | McCollister AM1497 adopted |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | McCollister AM382 withdrawn |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | McCollister AM1497 filed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-03-09 | Legislature | McCollister AM382 filed |
2017-01-30 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2017 |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-12 | Legislature | Date of introduction |