NE LB330 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-19 - Notice of hearing for January 28, 2021
Pending: Legislature Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Raise the jurisdictional age limit for juvenile court to age twenty-one years for certain purposes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Raise the jurisdictional age limit for juvenile court to age twenty-one years for certain purposes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-19LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 28, 2021
2021-01-15LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2021-01-13LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback