NE LB320A | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Approved by Governor on May 5, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Approved by Governor on May 5, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriation Bill
Title
Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 43-3-3 (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 5, 2021 |
2021-04-29 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 29, 2021 |
2021-04-29 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-04-29 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 43-3-3 |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2021-04-14 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-03-31 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2021-03-30 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-03-29 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2021-03-29 | Legislature | Date of introduction |