NE LB306 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 13 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 13 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to good cause for voluntarily leaving employment under the Employment Security Law
Title
Change provisions relating to good cause for voluntarily leaving employment under the Employment Security Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - Legislature - Failed on Final Reading 20-15-14 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-02-07 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Legislature - Business and Labor AM71 adopted (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Legislature - Business and Labor AM71 adopted (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Crawford MO19 Reconsider the vote on final passage filed |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Failed on Final Reading 20-15-14 |
2019-02-22 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-02-13 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-02-08 | Legislature | McCollister name added |
2019-02-08 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2019-02-07 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-02-07 | Legislature | Business and Labor AM71 adopted |
2019-02-06 | Legislature | Business and Labor AM71 pending |
2019-01-31 | Legislature | Business and Labor AM71 filed |
2019-01-31 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM71 |
2019-01-18 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 28, 2019 |
2019-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |