NE LB3 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-27 - Provisions/portions of LB3 amended into LB528 by AM556
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-27 - Provisions/portions of LB3 amended into LB528 by AM556
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change notice requirements for school district budget hearings and require access to school district data
Title
Change notice requirements for school district budget hearings and require access to school district data
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Briese [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB3 amended into LB528 by AM556 |
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2021-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 02, 2021 |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2021-01-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |